IL HB3643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the term "public utility" does not include pipeline companies that have a demonstrated history of not acting in the interest of public convenience and necessity in Illinois. Provides that in its determination of public convenience and necessity for a proposed pipeline or facility designed or intended to transport crude oil and any alternate locations for such proposed pipeline or facility, the Commission shall consider any evidence or externality presented by a party or other entity participating in the proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-PROCEEDING & PIPELINES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseTo Environmental Regulations Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Environmental Regulations Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220515-401Amended CodeCitation Text
22053-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback