IL HB3634 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Article of the School Code. Requires a school board to develop and implement a policy for notifying the parent of each student of any school bus stop located within 500 feet of the residence of a person required to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
SCH CD-BUS STOP-SEX OFFENDER
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Andrew Skoog [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |