IL HB3632 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that an "abused child" includes a child whose parent or immediate family member, among others, causes or permits a child to suffer unjustifiable or significant mental suffering. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that "abuse" includes emotional abuse. Defines "emotional abuse" as unjustifiable or significant mental suffering caused or permitted by a person to another person.
Title
DOMESTIC-EMOTIONAL ABUSE
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3632&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3632.htm |