IL HB3631 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Excludes from the definition of "employee" an employee employed as a player who is 28 years old or younger, a manager, a coach, or an athletic trainer by a minor league professional baseball team not affiliated with a major league baseball club, if (A) the minor league professional baseball team does not operate for more than 7 months in any calendar year or (B) during the preceding calendar year, the minor league professional baseball team's average receipts for any 6-month period of the year were not more than 33 1/3% of its average receipts for the other 6 months of the year. Effective immediately.
Title
MINIMUM WAGE LAW BASEBALL
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0192 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |