IL HB3630 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that if a generic equivalent for a brand name drug is approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration, plans that provide coverage for prescription drugs through the use of a drug formulary that are amended, delivered, issued, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2022 shall comply with specified requirements. Provides that the Department of Insurance may adopt rules to implement provisions concerning notice of change of drug formulary. In provisions concerning a contract between a health insurer and a pharmacy benefit manager, provides that a pharmacy benefit manager must update and publish maximum allowable cost pricing information according to specified requirements, must provide a reasonable administrative appeal procedure to allow pharmacies to challenge maximum allowable costs, and must comply with specified requirements if an appeal is denied. Sets forth provisions concerning pharmacy benefit manager contracts; specified requirements that a pharmacy benefit manager shall comply with; and specified requirements that an auditing entity shall comply with when conducting a pharmacy audit. Provides that a violation of specified provisions is an unfair method of competition and unfair and deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance. Sets forth provisions concerning applicability of the Pharmacy Benefit Managers Article of the Illinois Insurance Code, and provisions concerning fiduciary responsibility of a pharmacy benefit manager. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Sets forth provisions concerning reimbursement of professional dispensing fees and acquisition costs for pharmacy providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-03-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.37Amended CodeCitation Text
2155424Amended CodeCitation Text
2155513b1Amended CodeCitation Text
2155513b1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
2155513b1.3New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-36Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback