IL HB3629 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $26,000,000 to the State Board of Education for the purpose of providing a grant to City of Chicago School District 299 to employ individuals licensed as school nurses to provide health care-related services to students in the district and to eliminate any contracts with outside entities entered into to provide nurses for the district’s schools. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$ISBE-CPS-SCHOOL NURSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3629&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB3629.pdf |