IL HB3629 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the REAL ID Compliant Identification Cards Act. Provides standards for the issuance of REAL ID compliant identification cards (REAL ID cards). Provides that an individual who possesses an Illinois driver's license or Illinois Disabled Person Identification Card may be issued a REAL ID card, but no individual may hold both a REAL ID card and a non-REAL ID card. Provides standards for rejection of applications, revocation and cancellation, violations, and limitations on use. Provides that the fees for REAL ID cards are as follows: original $75, renewal $75, corrected $50, duplicate $75, and expedited card $150. Provides that collected fees are deposited in the Secretary of State Identification Security and Theft Prevention Fund and sets forth purposes for the use of those funds. Amends the Secretary of State Act to provide where federal agencies or agencies of any state government impose a fee upon the Secretary of State for the use of any data or communications systems maintained by those agencies, the Secretary of State may impose a reasonable reciprocal fee for any data or services provided to those agencies. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide that non-REAL ID cards shall have the phrase "Not for REAL ID Purposes" appearing on the face of the card and the color or design of the non-REAL ID cards shall be unique from REAL ID cards. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure to provide that common law name changes adopted in this State are invalid, and all changes of name shall be pursuant to marriage or other legal proceedings. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ID COMPLIANT ID CARDS
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3629&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3629.htm |