IL HB3626 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that any person seeking to address public officials in an open meeting shall be allowed to do so at least once per meeting, and any rule limiting a person to speaking no more than once in a given number of days shall be void. Allows the public body to reasonably limit the amount of time given to a person to address public officials during an open meeting. Provides that there shall be nothing under the rules established and recorded by the public body requiring persons seeking to address public officials to do anything more than state his or her name for the record immediately prior to addressing the public officials.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-RIGHT TO SPEAK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3626&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3626.htm |