IL HB3620 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that a pet shop operator may offer for sale only those dogs or cats obtained from an animal control center, animal care facility, kennel, pound, or training facility operated by any subdivision of local, State, or federal government, or a humane society or rescue organization. Provides that no pet shop operator may offer for sale any dog or cat obtained from a breeder unless the breeder holds a valid USDA Class "A" license as defined in the Code of Federal Regulations implementing the federal Animal Welfare Act, listing all site addresses where regulated animals are located; the breeder owns or possesses no more than 5 female dogs or cats capable of reproduction in any 12-month period; and no more than 5 female dogs or cats capable of reproduction are housed at the site address where the retail animal was born or housed, including animals owned by persons other than the breeder. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
PET SHOP DOG/CAT SOURCING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3620&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3620.htm |