IL HB3616 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: In a provision concerning commitment for treatment, provides that the court shall order that the placement be on an outpatient basis unless the court determines: (1) that outpatient treatment will not provide reasonable assurances for the safety of the defendant and others or provide reasonable assurances that the defendant can be restored to fitness on an outpatient basis, or (2) that clinically appropriate outpatient treatment is not accessible, or optimal, due to cost, waiting lists, treatment limits, or other barriers. Provides that the defendant shall be placed in a state operated facility under certain circumstances unless there are no beds available.
Title
CRIM PRO-UNFIT DEFENDANT-TREAT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 104-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |