IL HB3615 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that in an investigation in which the alleged perpetrator of abuse or neglect is a school employee, including, but not limited to, a school teacher or administrator, and the recommendation is to determine the report to be indicated, in addition to other procedures as set forth and defined in Department rules and procedures, the employee's due process rights shall also include: (i) the right to a copy of the investigation summary; (ii) the right to review the specific allegations which gave rise to the investigation; and (iii) the right to an administrator's teleconference which shall be convened to provide the school employee with the opportunity to present documentary evidence or other information that supports his or her position and to provide information before a final finding is entered. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Children and Family Services to inform the school employee of his or her right: (a) to confront the accuser, if the accuser is 14 years of age or older; (b) to review the specific allegations which gave rise to the investigation; and (c) to review all materials and evidence that have been submitted to the Department in support of the allegation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-ABUSE RPT-SCHOOL EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-15HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-15HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-000-000
2017-03-08HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32557.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback