IL HB3607 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consent by Illinois Minors to Health Care Services Act. Provides that minors 12 years or older who may (rather than may have) come into contact with any sexually transmitted disease may give consent to the furnishing of health care services or counseling related to the prevention, diagnosis, or treatment (rather than only the diagnosis or treatment) of the disease. Provides that anyone involved in the furnishing of health care services or counseling (rather than only health care services) to the minor shall, upon the minor's consent, make reasonable efforts to involve the family of the minor in his or her treatment if the person furnishing treatment believes that the involvement of the family will not be detrimental to the progress and care of the minor.
Title
HEALTH CARE-CONSENT OF MINORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 210 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3607&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3607.htm |