IL HB3600 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Taxing Body Refinancing by Popular Vote Act. Provides that no taxing district may renew or refinance its indebtedness in a way that requires the extension of property taxes for the payment of debt service in a taxable year that is later than the taxable year in which the indebtedness would otherwise mature unless the question of such renewal or refinancing is submitted to the electors of the district at a regular election and approved by a majority of the electors voting on the question.
Title
PROP TX-DEBT LEVY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3600&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3600.htm |