IL HB3599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a person detained in the Department of Juvenile Justice may institute a post-conviction appeal if in the proceedings which resulted in his or her conviction there was a substantial denial of his or her rights under the Constitution of the United States or of the State of Illinois or both; or there is newly discovered evidence not available to the person at the time of the proceeding that resulted in his or her conviction that establishes a substantial basis to believe that the defendant is actually innocent by clear and convincing evidence. Provides that this proceeding may be commenced within a reasonable period of time after the person's adjudication. Provides that only one petition may be filed by a petitioner under this provision without leave of the court. Makes other changes.
Title
JUV COURT-POST CONVICT APPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |