IL HB3597 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to establish a voucher program to promote the use of electric vehicles by offering, subject to appropriation, a voucher in specified amounts per electric vehicle purchased or leased. Requires vouchers to be (1) made available for electric vehicles that are registered in Illinois or recognized under the International Registration Plan, (2) issued only to applicants who have a primary residence in Illinois, and (3) made available for direct purchases, purchases through third-party bulk orders, and leasing of electric vehicles. Provides that an applicant shall submit a proof of purchase, lease, or other binding contract regarding the electric vehicle in order to be awarded the voucher. Contains other requirements. Defines "electric vehicle". Contains other provisions.
Title
EPA-ELECTRIC TRUCK VOUCHERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-009-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3597&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3597.htm |