IL HB3595 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused, Neglected, or Dependent Minors Article of the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if the minor is being restored to the custody of a parent, legal custodian, or guardian who lives outside of Illinois, and an Interstate Compact has been requested and refused, the court may order the Department of Children and Family Services to arrange for an assessment of the minor's proposed living arrangement and for ongoing monitoring of the health, safety, and best interest of the minor and compliance with any order of protective supervision. Provides that if a motion is filed to modify or vacate a private guardianship order and return the child to a parent, guardian, or legal custodian, the court may order the Department of Children and Family Services to assess the minor's current and proposed living arrangements and to provide ongoing monitoring of the health, safety, and best interest of the minor during the pendency of the motion to assist the court in making that determination. Provides that whenever a petition is filed to reinstate wardship, prior to granting the petition, the court may order the Department of Children and Family Services to assess the minor's current and proposed living arrangements and to provide ongoing monitoring of the health, safety, and best interest of the minor during the pendency of the petition to assist the court in making that determination. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-DCFS ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0489 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 099-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |