IL HB3581 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, the Illinois Student Assistance Commission must implement and administer a program to award Early Childhood Workforce Free College grants to all eligible child care workers seeking an associate or bachelor's degree from a public institution or a regionally accredited, online-only early childhood education degree program; defines terms. Specifies grant eligibility and renewal requirements. Creates the Early Childhood Workforce Advisory Committee to advise the Commission on all matters relating to the Early Childhood Workforce Free College grant program and on the ways to improve and expand the early childhood workforce in this State. Provides for the membership and support of the Committee and requires the Committee to (i) study and make recommendations to the Commission that are related to the implementation of the Early Childhood Workforce Free College grant program, (ii) conduct an analysis from data received by the Commission to ensure the program is at full utilization, (iii) address access issues to the program, including, but not limited to, geographic, financial, cultural, and workplace settings, and (iv) address ways to expand the early childhood workforce in this State. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Early Childhood Workforce Free College Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
HGHR ED-EARLY CHILDHOOD GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 65.105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |