IL HB3579 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the threshold amount of theft not from the person and retail theft that enhances the offense from a misdemeanor to a felony to $2,000 and if based on a prior conviction must only be for felony theft. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the Secretary of State may, upon request of a person committed to the Department of Corrections, issue a limited period identification card to the committed person that shall be valid during the period of his or her incarceration. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 concerning the reduction or modification of a defendant's sentence. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that not later than 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Director of Corrections, in consultation with the Independent Review Committee created by the amendatory Act, shall develop and release publicly on the Department of Corrections website a risk and needs assessment system. Describes the system. Provides that a committed person shall be assigned to an institution or facility of the Department that is located within 200 miles of his or her residence immediately before the committed person's admission to the Department. Provides that a committed person who successfully completes evidence-based recidivism reduction programming or productive activities shall receive additional sentence credits. Prohibits handcuffs, shackles, or restraints of any kind to be used on new mothers for 3 months after delivery. Provides that a person at least 60 years of age who has served at least two-thirds of his or her sentence may petition the Department for participation in an atonement and restorative justice program prepared by the Department. Amends the County Jail Act to make conforming changes.
Title
IL FIRST STEP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 116-2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 125 | 17.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-7-2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8B-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8B-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | Art. 5-8B headin | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3579&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3579.htm |