IL HB3575 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the chief judge of the circuit by rule may permit the personal appearance of the defendant by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television and computerized video conference, at a hearing at which no witness testimony will be taken concerning the defendant's fitness to stand trial: (1) 90-day hearings; (2) trials with special provisions and assistance; (3) discharge hearings; and (4) proceedings after acquittal by reason of insanity. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Department of Human Services and the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts shall implement a pilot project between the circuit courts in 2 counties and Department of Human Services facilities treating persons unfit to stand trial or not guilty by reason of insanity. Provides that the purpose of the pilot project is to determine the feasibility and desirability of using video conference technology for hearings involving persons who are unfit to stand trial and persons who have been determined not guilty by reason of insanity. Provides that the Department of Human Services and the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts shall submit a joint report to the General Assembly 6 months after the pilot project between the 2 counties and Department facilities has been operational for at least 2 years. Provides that the report shall: (1) evaluate the effectiveness of the video conference hearing process; and (2) make recommendations concerning the implementation of video conference hearings in all counties. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
CRIM PRO--DEFENDANT-CLOSED CIR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0486 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-040-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 106D-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 106D-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |