IL HB3571 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 1% of the expenses claimed by the taxpayer as a federal income tax deduction pursuant to Section 179 of the Internal Revenue Code for the tax year. Provides that the taxpayer may sell, assign, or transfer the credit. Provides that the maximum aggregate amount of credits awarded for those purposes may not exceed $45,000,000 in any calendar year. Amends the Uniform Penalty and Interest Act to provide that, if the amount of the credit is reduced because the claims for credit exceed the maximum aggregate amount of the credit, then no underpayment penalty or interest shall accrue on the additional tax so long as the additional tax is paid within 60 days after the notice of reduction. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-INVESTMENT CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 735 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3571&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3571.htm |