IL HB3570 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State aid formula provisions of the School Code. Provides that, for the 2017-2018 school year and each school year thereafter, a school district with a high school dropout rate that is at least 2 times the State high school dropout rate shall receive an incentive weighting of 2 times the Foundation Level of support for each high school dropout who has been dropped from the school enrollment rolls for at least one month and has been reenrolled into an evidence-based model and best program practices program for high school dropouts. Contains provisions concerning the program. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ST AID FORMULA-DROPOUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3570&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3570.htm |