IL HB3567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Provides that no charter shall be granted that would locate a charter school or charter school campus in a zip code in which a public school was closed within 10 school years prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act or that would locate a charter school or charter school campus in a zip code that is contiguous to a zip code in which a public school was closed within 10 school years prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that no charter shall be granted unless the General Assembly has appropriated transition impact aid for the school district where the charter school is to be located. Provides that, for charter schools established on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the board of education in a city having a population exceeding 500,000 shall designate attendance boundaries for those charter schools. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CHARTER SCH LIMITATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-008-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-07HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527A-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback