IL HB3567 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit in an amount equal to 10% of any long-term care insurance premiums paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year. Provides that the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LONG TERM CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3567&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3567.htm |