IL HB3566 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that if there are insufficient funds in the Injured Workers' Benefit Fund to pay all claims, an amount of money sufficient to make up the deficiency shall be considered to be always appropriated from the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission Operations Fund, the Rate Adjustment Fund, the Settlement Fund, and the Second Injury Fund. Provides that the minimum payout from the Injured Workers' Benefit Fund for death or permanent total disability is 364 weeks of benefits payable in a lump sum. Provides that proof that an employer was not insured or is not insured creates a rebuttable presumption that the employer knowingly failed to comply with specified provisions of the Act.
Title
WRK COMP CONSIDER APPROPRIATED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | To Workers Compensation Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3566&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3566.htm |