IL HB3564 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Anthony Gay Law. Creates the Isolated Confinement Restriction Act. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 consecutive days. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 days in any 180-day period. Provides that while out of cell, committed persons may have access to activities, including, but not limited, to: job assignments, educational classes, vocational classes, meals, recreation, yard or gymnasium, day room, medical appointments, visits, and group therapy. Provides exceptions. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall post on the Department's official website quarterly reports on the use of isolated confinement. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2022, except that some provisions are effective immediately.
Title
ISOLATED CONFINEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Sen. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-003-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-040-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-8-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |