IL HB3550 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, when procuring construction or construction-related projects with a total value over the small purchase maximum, the construction agency shall provide a bid preference to a responsive and responsible bidder that is an Illinois business (previously just responsible). Provides that the construction agency shall allocate to the lowest bid by an Illinois business that is responsible and responsive. Provides that this only applies to projects where a bid has been submitted by a business that is not an Illinois business. Defines "Illinois business".
Title
PROCUREMENT-CONSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3550&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3550.htm |