IL HB3542 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Foster Children's Bill of Rights Act. In addition to other specified rights, provides that it is the policy of the State that every child and adult in the care of the Department of Children and Family Services who is placed in foster care shall have the right to be placed in the least restrictive and most family-like setting available and in close proximity to his or her parent's home consistent with his or her health, safety, best interests, and special needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOSTER CHILDREN-RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205215Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback