IL HB3540 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to determine if oil and gas leases submitted with an application for a permit or transfer of a permit for a well are operative on the basis that prior oil and gas leases covering the same lands have terminated due to non-development or non-production. Requires that the determinations be based upon affidavits of non-development or non-production from knowledgeable individuals familiar with the history of development and production of oil or gas as to such lands, together with other evidence, which create a rebuttable presumption that the prior oil and gas leases have terminated and are of no further force and effect and that the submitted oil and gas leases are operative and effective. Provides that a court order or judgment declaring the prior leases terminated is not required for such determinations, except in extraordinary circumstances where the determinations cannot reasonably be concluded from the affidavits or evidence submitted to or available from the Department. Provides that, upon the Department's determination of a rebuttable presumption, the Department shall provide the current permittee with notice and a 30-day opportunity to request a hearing to rebut the presumption before a final determination on a lease is made. Provides that any determination made by the Department shall not diminish the rights or obligations of any current permittee of a well that are otherwise provided by statute or regulation of the Department. Provides that any request for a determination shall require the payment of a nonrefundable fee. Requires all determinations on leases by the Department be made no later than 90 days after the Department's receipt of a valid request for the determination. Effective immediately.
Title
OIL AND GAS ACT-LEASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 72 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0484 |
2015-10-30 | House | Effective Date October 30, 2015 |
2015-10-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-09-03 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-09-02 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-09-02 | House | House Concurs |
2015-09-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 072-038-000 |
2015-09-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-09-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-08-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-08-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-08-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-08-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-08-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-08-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000 |
2015-08-19 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 19, 2015 |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 725 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |