IL HB3539 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires bidders to obtain an equal pay certificate before a purchasing agency may issue a contract to the bidder. Provides for the Department of Employment Security to issue the certificates. Specifies information to be included in an application for an equal pay certificate. Requires bidders to comply with the Equal Pay Act of 2003, Equal Wage Act, Illinois Human Rights Act, and Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Equal Pay Certificate Fund. Provides for moneys in the Fund to be used to administer the equal pay certificate requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT EQUAL PAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2017
2017-05-17SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-004-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-049-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-07HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-21HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-10New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-15New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-20New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-25New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-30New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-35New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-40New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-45New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-5New CodeSee Bill Text
3050047-50New CodeSee Bill Text
30500Art. 47 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback