IL HB3533 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Sexual Assault Survivors Protection Act. Establishes procedures that apply to the collection and use of known reference samples of DNA from a victim of a sex offense or alleged sex offense, and to known reference samples of DNA from any individual that was voluntarily provided for the purpose of exclusion, and to any profiles developed from those samples. Provides that law enforcement agencies and their agents shall use these DNA samples or profiles only for purposes directly related to the incident being investigated. Provides that a law enforcement agency or agent of a law enforcement agency may not compare any of these samples or profiles with DNA samples or profiles that do not relate to the incident being investigated. Provides that a law enforcement agency or agent of a law enforcement agency may not include any of these DNA profiles in any database that allows these samples to be compared to or matched with profiles derived from DNA evidence obtained from crime scenes. Provides that any part of a DNA sample that remains after the requested testing or analysis has been performed shall be securely stored and may only be used in accordance with the restrictions on use and disclosure of the sample provided in these provisions. Provides that an agent of a law enforcement agency may not provide any part of these DNA samples or profiles to any person or entity other than the law enforcement agency that provided them, except portions of these remaining DNA samples may be provided to the defendant when authorized by court order. Provides that the database profile of a person whose DNA profile has been voluntarily provided for purposes of exclusion shall be expunged from all public and private databases if the person has no past or present offense or pending charge which qualifies that person for inclusion within this State's DNA database as provided in the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT SURVIVORS-DNA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-07HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback