IL HB3531 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that if a hospital has a gestational surrogacy contract on file for a gestational surrogate or has otherwise received the gestational surrogacy contract from a gestational surrogate, the hospital may not deny an intended parent entry into the delivery room where the gestational surrogate is being induced or in labor. Provides exceptions if: medical personnel determine that the gestational surrogate's life or health could be jeopardized; the gestational surrogacy contract prohibits an intended parent from being present; or medical personnel determine there is other good cause to prohibit an intended parent from being present, including, but not limited to, if the intended parent is causing a disturbance or other security concerns. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
HOSPITALS-SURROGACY CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0286 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-002 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |