IL HB3528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Makes changes concerning continuing education under the Act, including hours, approval of courses, curriculum, and education providers. Adds provisions concerning education provider licenses. Removes provisions concerning continuing education schools. Makes changes in provisions concerning leasing agent licenses. Prohibits any leasing agent or leasing agent permit holder from engaging in activities that require a broker's or managing broker's license and from operating under a temporary leasing agent permit more than one time in that individual's lifetime. Makes changes to provisions concerning the Real Estate Administration and Disciplinary Board, including adding members so that it is composed of 15 (rather than 9) and requiring term limits. Repeals outdated provisions and provisions concerning confidentiality, offerings not meeting continuing education requirements, and the Real Estate Education Advisory Council and makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE LICENSE-CONT ED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0188
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Business & Occupational Licenses Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-08HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254541-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-23Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-60Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-68Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-78Repealed CodeCitation Text
22545425-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-10Repealed CodeCitation Text
22545430-15Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-25Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-26Repealed CodeCitation Text
2254545-27Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-28Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-80Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-85Repealed CodeCitation Text
225454Art. 30 headingAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback