IL HB3523 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that "disaster" includes cyber incidents. Defines "cyber incident". Requires the Governor to, to the greatest extent practicable, delegate or assign authority to the Director of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to manage, coordinate, and direct all resources by orders issued at the time of a disaster. Effective immediately.
Title
IEMA-CYBER ATTACK
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0485 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-013-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | To Executive- Government Operations |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |