IL HB3523 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $4,500,000 from the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Fund to the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Commission for historic preservation purposes. Appropriates $600,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Fund. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$SUP CT HISTORIC PRESERV COMM
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3523&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB3523.pdf |