IL HB3519 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. In the definition of "signature", includes a named signed in ink or signed in digitized form (rather than a name signed in ink or in digitized form). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-DIGITIZED SIGNATURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-001-000
2017-03-10HouseTo Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback