IL HB3518 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a Tier 1 participant of a pension fund or retirement system, except for a pension fund established under the Downstate Police, Downstate Firefighter, Chicago Police, or Chicago Firefighter Article, may irrevocably elect to have increases to his or her retirement annuity or supplemental annuity based on the annual unadjusted percentage increase in the consumer price index-u for a specified 12-month period. Requires each pension fund or retirement system to inform Tier 1 participants that they have the option to make that election. Provides that the changes apply without regard to whether the Tier 1 participant is in active service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TIER 1 ANNUAL INCREASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-14 | House | To Pension Reform Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |