IL HB3518 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that no member of the Direct Child Welfare Service Employee License Board may have a pending or indicated report of child abuse or neglect or a pending complaint or criminal conviction of any of the offenses or any conditions set forth in a specified provision of the Child Care Act of 1969. Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Sets forth non-waivable circumstances under which a person may not receive a license for, have a licensed renewed for, be employed by, or reside in, if an adult person, a child care facility. Provides processes by which an applicant for licensure, a licensee, an employee of a facility licensed by the Department of Children and Family Services, or an adult person residing in a licensed child care facility who was convicted of a felony other than a felony listed in provisions concerning non-waivable circumstances, or has committed other specified offenses, may receive a waiver by the Department or the agency seeking to grant, renew, employ, or issue the license. Contains provisions concerning waiver reviews; appeals of an adverse waiver; Department rules on guidelines for granting a waiver; and other matters. Removes provisions that prohibit a person from receiving a child care facility license or working at a child care facility if the person has been declared a sexually dangerous person or has committed specified offenses.
Title
CHILD CARE-LICENSURE BANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3518&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3518.htm |