IL HB3515 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Youth Health Protection Act. Provides that a medical doctor shall not prescribe, provide, administer, or deliver puberty-suppressing drugs or cross-sex hormones and shall not perform surgical orchiectomy or castration, urethroplasty, vaginoplasty, mastectomy, phalloplasty, or metoidioplasty on biologically healthy and anatomically normal persons under the age of 18 for the purpose of treating the subjective, internal psychological condition of gender dysphoria or gender discordance. Provides that any efforts to modify the anatomy, physiology, or biochemistry of a biologically healthy person under the age of 18 who experiences gender dysphoria or gender discordance shall be considered unprofessional conduct and shall be subject to discipline by the licensing entity or disciplinary review board. Provides that no medical doctor or mental health provider shall refer any person under the age of 18 to any medical doctor for chemical or surgical interventions to treat gender dysphoria or gender discordance. Contains definitions, a statement of purpose, and legislative findings. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987 to make related changes.
Title
YOUTH HEALTH PROTECTION ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3515&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3515.htm |