IL HB3512 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In provisions concerning the Advocacy Office for Children and Families, requires the Advocacy Office to designate for each foster child an employee with legal knowledge of the foster process to guide foster parents throughout the foster process and keep them informed of their rights and responsibilities. Amends the Foster Parent Law. Creates a private right of action under specified provisions of the Act concerning foster parent rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-FOSTER PARENT RIGHTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055eAmended CodeCitation Text
205201-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback