IL HB3511 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Maternal Mental Health Conditions Education, Early Diagnosis, and Treatment Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall develop educational materials for health care professionals and patients about maternal mental health conditions. Provides that a birthing hospital shall, on or before January 1, 2021, distribute these materials to employees regularly assigned to work with pregnant or postpartum women and incorporate these materials in any employee training that is related to patient care of pregnant or postpartum women. Requires a birthing hospital to supplement the materials provided by the Department to include relevant resources to the region or community in which the birthing hospital is located. Requires the educational materials to include specified information. Contains definitions and findings.
Title
IDPH-MATERNAL MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0512 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |