IL HB3509 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Horse Racing Act of 1975. Provides that, upon collection of the fee accompanying the application for an occupation license or any other fees, the Board may make daily deposits of the fees with the organization licensee or the horsemen's bookkeeper at a race meeting. The organization licensee or the horsemen's bookkeeper shall either use ACH electronic transfer of funds or issue a check, payable to the order of the Illinois Racing Board, for monies deposited under this Section within 24 hours of receipt of the monies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HORSE RACING-DEPOSIT OF FEES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230515.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback