IL HB3508 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that by July 1, 2019, the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall develop a Transition Assistance Program for veterans who have been discharged from the Armed Forces of the United States or the National Guard of any state. Provides that the program shall be designed to assist veterans in successfully transitioning from military to civilian life in Illinois and shall complement the transition program offered by the United States Department of Defense. Provides that the program shall include specified Illinois-specific transition assistance resources and information covering specified topics. Provides that the program shall provide information to noncitizens who are leaving military service in Illinois or who have already been discharged from military service in Illinois. Provides that the information shall detail how to become United States citizens, including where to acquire State legal assistance. Provides that the Illinois National Guard shall inform its members that it will assist noncitizen members in acquiring United States citizenship as soon as they are eligible. Provides that if a noncitizen member requests such assistance, then the Illinois National Guard shall assist the member in filing all forms and paperwork necessary to become a United States citizen. Effective immediately.
Title
DEPT VET AFF-TRANSITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3508&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3508.htm |