IL HB3507 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Re-assigned to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Gender Tax Repeal Act. Provides that a business shall not charge a different price for any goods or services that are substantially similar if those goods are priced differently based on the gender of the individuals for whom the goods are marketed and intended. Provides for civil penalties. Provides that the Act does not alter or affect the provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code or other laws that govern health care service plans or insurer underwriting or rating practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENDER TAX REPEAL ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12HouseRe-assigned to Rules Committee
2024-03-05HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback