IL HB3507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compulsory Attendance Article of the School Code. Allows a child to be absent from school on a particular day or days or at a particular time of day for the reason that his or her parent or legal guardian is an active duty member of the uniformed services and has been called to duty for, is on leave from, or has immediately returned from deployment to a combat zone or combat-support postings. Provides that such a student shall be granted 10 days of excused absences in any school year and, at the discretion of the school board, additional excused absences to visit the student's parent or legal guardian relative to such leave or deployment of the parent or legal guardian. Requires the student and parent or legal guardian to obtain assignments from the student's teacher prior to any period of excused absence and for ensuring that such assignments are completed by the student prior to his or her return to school from such period of excused absence. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EXCUSED ABSENCE-MILITAR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0185 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |