IL HB3506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. With respect to the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, beginning in assessment year 2017, the taxpayer's household income shall be reduced by any amounts paid as Medicare premiums. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX-SR FREEZE-MEDICARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback