IL HB3505 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Smart Phone Kill Switch Act. Requires any smart phone that is manufactured after the effective date of the Act and is sold or purchased at retail in this State to be equipped with the capability to render that smart phone completely inoperable if the phone is lost or stolen. Prohibits wireless telephone service providers and wireless telephone equipment manufacturers from charging any additional fee for a smart phone that has the capability of rendering the smart phone completely inoperable if it is lost or stolen. Provides a definition of "smart phone". Requires a wireless telephone service provider to insure a smart phone against theft if the wireless telephone service provider provides service to a smart phone that does not have the capability of rendering the phone completely inoperable.
Title
SMART PHONE KILL SWITCH
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Rep. Andrew Skoog [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3505&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3505.htm |