IL HB3500 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Counties Code. Provides that the Department of Public Health and each county or multiple-county health department or public health district may provide to a person who is at risk of experiencing or who is experiencing an opioid-related overdose a kit containing naloxone hydrochloride or any other opioid antagonist approved for the treatment of an opioid overdose by the United States Food and Drug Administration. Provides that a person may administer an opioid antagonist that is provided by the Department, a county or multiple-county health department, or a public health district to a person who is experiencing an opioid-related overdose. Provides that a person who in good faith and without compensation administers an opioid antagonist to a person who is experiencing an opioid-related overdose is not liable for any civil or other damages as the result of any act or omission by the person rendering the care, or as the result of any act or failure to act to arrange for further medical treatment or care, for the person experiencing the overdose, unless the person while rendering the care acts with gross negligence, willful misconduct, or intentional wrongdoing. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH DEPARTMENTS-NALOXONE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Tabled |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-251 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-25028 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3500&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3500.htm |