IL HB3498 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board shall establish and implement a program that provides tuition to the first 1,500 students per year that enroll at each designated community college, which will be paid from the Community College Free Tuition Trust Fund. Provides that 16 community colleges shall be designated for the program for a 2-year period on a rotating schedule determined by the Illinois Community College Board. Creates the Community College Free Tuition Trust Fund as a nonappropriated trust fund to be held outside the State Treasury. Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Requires every bank under the Act to pay into the Trust Fund. Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Requires every credit union to pay into the Trust Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMM COLLEGE-FREE TUITION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108052-26New CodeSee Bill Text
20530554.5New CodeSee Bill Text
205548.7New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback