IL HB3496 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. For offenses committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, provides that a prisoner who is serving a sentence for predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated kidnapping or aggravated battery when the victim is a child under the age of 13 years or a person with a severe or profound intellectual disability, or a second or subsequent offense of luring of a minor shall receive no sentence credit and shall serve the entire sentence imposed by the court.
Title
CD CORR-CHILD SEX OFFENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Tabled |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3496&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3496.htm |