IL HB3493 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill creating the Prescription Drug Affordability Act, and makes changes. Modifies provisions concerning the membership and powers of the Prescription Drug Affordability Board. Modifies provisions concerning the membership of the Prescription Drug Affordability Stakeholder Council. Specifies requirements concerning drug cost affordability review. Provides additional duties power and duties for the Attorney General concerning remedies under the Act. Provides additional Board reporting requirements under the Act. Provides requirements concerning Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA) plans and Medicare Part D plans. Provides findings provisions. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
PRESCRIPTION DRUG-AFFORD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g) |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 008-005-001 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Remains in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 008-008-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |